WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF BASKETMAKERS 2011 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £100.81k £98.07k £98.82k £125.78k £113.84k
Total expenditure £81.66k £87.34k £101.17k £100.74k £105.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A