WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF BASKETMAKERS 2011 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1141986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM KENNETH ASLET Chair 09 September 2015
THE RALPH VAUGHAN WILLIAMS SOCIETY Received: On time
FRIENDS OF EPSOM GENERAL AND WEST PARK HOSPITALS Received: On time
Hedley French Trustee 03 March 2021 None on record
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES HIPKINS Trustee 26 March 2012 None on record
JULIAN JOHN ADAMS Trustee 28 January 2013 None on record
STEPHEN NICHOLAS JONATHAN GEE Trustee 28 January 2013 None on record
JOHN D'ORSAY ROBINSON Trustee 18 May 2011 None on record
ANTHONY BEN CHARLWOOD Trustee 02 September 2020
ST MARGARET PATTENS CHURCH Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET PATTENS CHURCH Received: On time
Lady Dorothy Newlands of Lauriston Trustee 04 March 2020 None on record
PHILIP MILES Trustee 09 September 2015 None on record
PETER FRANCIS YARKER Trustee 26 March 2012 None on record