Financial history LYTHAM ACADEMY OF THEATRE ARTS

Charity number: 1141547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £23.22k £22.32k £22.32k £3.08k £5.10k
Total expenditure £21.60k £27.07k £27.07k £2.42k £1.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A