Accounts and annual returns AFRICAN COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1143218
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 28 April 2021 31 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2020 03 May 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2018 Not Required