Financial history SUSSEX CLUBS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1142272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £75.17k £79.72k £214.00k £322.14k £482.81k
Total expenditure £85.48k £104.37k £202.77k £359.10k £456.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £10.50k £73.46k £73.65k
Income from government grants £21.00k £2.64k £14.00k £44.49k £27.17k