THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES

Charity number: 1142813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £19.05m £19.65m £21.16m £20.65m £23.13m
Total expenditure £21.47m £22.46m £24.57m £25.01m £27.01m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £45.00k £5.00k £7.00k £6.00k £34.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £968.00k £1.13m £1.13m £649.00k £1.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.79m £18.28m £19.74m £19.72m £21.21m
Income - Other £252.00k £240.00k £287.00k £268.00k £250.00k
Income - Legacies £20.00k £5.00k £0 £0 £34.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.71m £20.18m £22.02m £22.38m £24.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £2.28m £2.55m £2.63m £3.02m
Expenditure - Governance £711.00k £673.00k £688.00k £747.00k £670.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £8.37m £9.14m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.05m £2.28m £2.25m £2.27m £2.79m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0