Accounts and annual returns MID CHESHIRE MIND

Charity number: 1142838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 March 2023 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 March 2023 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window