Financial history THE NEW VICTORIA HOSPITAL LIMITED

Charity number: 1141784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.89m £16.70m £18.41m £25.24m £25.06m
Total expenditure £18.93m £18.19m £20.63m £21.65m £25.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £29.00k £10.89m £2.25m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.17k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £16.88m £16.70m £18.41m £25.24m £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £25.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £102 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £616.12k £633.01k £732.00k £843.00k £23.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £616.12k £633.01k £732.00k £843.00k £986.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £18.32m £17.55m £19.89m £20.80m £1.30m