KARIMIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1143245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 December 2016 On time Download