KARIMIA ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1143245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR MUHAMMED ASHRAF Trustee 10 May 2011 None on record
Riaz Khan Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Moulana Mohammed Ishaque Trustee 26 July 2017 None on record
Jamil Rabbi Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
MOHAMMED YOUNAS Trustee 30 April 2013
KARIMIA INSTITUTE Received: On time
Mohammed Naheem Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
FAZLI RABBI KHAN Trustee 10 May 2011 None on record
MOHAMMED SULEMAN Trustee 10 May 2011
KARIMIA INSTITUTE Received: On time
Tariq Nasir Chair 01 December 1998
KARIMIA INSTITUTE Received: On time
MOHAMMAD IQBAL Trustee 10 May 2011 None on record
Nasir Mamood Trustee 18 January 2017 None on record
ZIA KHAN Trustee 18 January 2017
KARIMIA INSTITUTE Received: On time
CHAUDHRY ABDUL WAHID Trustee 10 May 2011 None on record