Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD UNION

Charity number: 1148622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window