Financial history UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD UNION

Charity number: 1148622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £1.81m £1.47m £1.70m £1.56m £1.37m
Total expenditure £1.73m £1.74m £1.62m £1.47m £1.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £101.32k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.55m £1.52m £1.47m £1.38m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £27.92k £67.32k £58.53k £3.07k £7.17k
Income - Charitable activities £226.16k £216.52k £178.32k £171.88k £1.02k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.60m £1.47m £1.43m £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £131.55k £147.69k £148.15k £43.75k £23.17k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.34k £9.50k £8.50k £8.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0