Trustees UNIVERSITY OF BRADFORD UNION

Charity number: 1148622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ahmed Sher Malik Chair 01 July 2021
None on record
Christian Busse Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Hamza Pervez Khan Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Iqra Tabassum Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Ajiroghene Ayokunle Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Adegboyega Michael Omole Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Gwendolen Bradshaw Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Safwatt Shehzad Muhammad Akhtar Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Lloyd Cameron Russell-Moyle Trustee 10 November 2020
THE CREW CLUB
Received: On time
Deborah Jane Cross Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Ram Saroop Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record