RELIEF AND REHABILITATION NETWORK (UK)

Charity number: 1143058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.38k £8.31k £5.70k £2 £110
Total expenditure £6.19k £9.94k £5.00k £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A