Financial history FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON

Charity number: 1147577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.53k £5.89k £5.07k £4.79k £5.08k
Total expenditure £4.91k £688 £48 £40 £40
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A