BORDERLANDS (SOUTH WEST) LTD

Charity number: 1143313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 10 August 2016 On time Download