BORDERLANDS (SOUTH WEST) LTD

Charity number: 1143313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RICHARD MCKAY Chair 05 May 2011
BRISTOL CITY OF SANCTUARY Received: On time
Peter William Forrest Browne Trustee 29 July 2017 None on record
Nick Tarr Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
Motcha Rakkini Mary Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
Robert Von Hawrylak Trustee 23 July 2019 None on record
ANTONIO STAVROU Trustee 05 May 2011 None on record
Cynthi Akelo Ochieng Trustee 07 October 2020 None on record
ANDREW MARCELLUS BENT Trustee 05 May 2011 None on record
MARY HOPPER Trustee 25 March 2013 None on record