Financial history DESIGN MIDLANDS LIMITED

Charity number: 1143920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £109.03k £151.87k £156.40k £114.51k £137.15k
Total expenditure £106.23k £138.78k £145.98k £112.83k £142.83k
Income from government contracts £54.50k N/A N/A £6.68k £6.00k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A