Financial history MINSTERACRES RETREAT CENTRE

Charity number: 1144385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £557.98k £612.01k £683.56k £532.11k £500.17k
Total expenditure £557.56k £542.49k £616.18k £529.58k £550.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £86.04k £69.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £198.96k £240.64k £302.98k £397.80k £292.24k
Income - Other trading activities £74.81k £70.24k £69.36k £58.13k £57.47k
Income - Charitable activities £280.31k £295.61k £305.56k £54.55k £135.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27 £46 £88 £115 £11
Income - Other £3.88k £5.48k £5.57k £21.52k £14.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £549.57k £535.43k £608.54k £525.13k £548.11k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.98k £7.05k £7.64k £4.45k £2.64k
Expenditure - Governance £6.05k £6.23k £12.66k £8.01k £5.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0