Financial history MARY LIDSTONE TRUST

Charity number: 1143031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £61.87k £60.65k £71.37k £60.49k £54.53k
Total expenditure £66.90k £78.89k £73.04k £34.37k £73.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A