Accounts and annual returns ABBOTT WELFARE CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1142661
Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 48 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 48 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required