ORION SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1145038
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £104.84k £149.58k £103.11k £122.21k £89.07k
Total expenditure £95.44k £112.59k £126.07k £127.80k £86.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A