THE OHMI TRUST

Charity number: 1143623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £116.89k £131.53k £108.72k £118.37k £147.96k
Total expenditure £154.70k £158.93k £109.89k £101.64k £104.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A