THE OHMI TRUST

Charity number: 1143623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR MARTIN FAUTLEY Trustee 27 February 2020
THE UK ASSOCIATION FOR MUSIC EDUCATION - MUSIC MARK Received: On time
MARTIN DYKE Trustee 15 June 2011 None on record
Ruth Lester OBE FRCS Trustee 27 February 2020
BIRMINGHAM WOMEN'S AND CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL CHARITY Received: On time
NICOLA MCLAUGHLIN Trustee 14 November 2011 None on record
Dr STEPHEN HETHERINGTON PhD, MBE Trustee 01 November 2011 None on record
CHRISTOPHER BLAKE MCLAUGHLIN Trustee 14 November 2011 None on record
Dr Andrew Palmer McPherson Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record