Trustees UNIVERSITY OF SURREY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1142479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Ting Yau | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Rose Dormor | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Hussain | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Akunna Obi | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Jon White | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kiara Blessing Kataike Lunani | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amel Boukabous | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shilpi Sahai | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Milton | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martine Ellen Carter | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Michael Dutton | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Emilia Massie | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.