KHOO TECK PUAT UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.40m £5.75m £5.80m £6.17m £5.20m
Total expenditure £1.14m £7.29m £1.12m £776.27k £691.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.40m £5.75m £5.80m £6.08m £5.20m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £91.14k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £6.96m £517.48k £18.61k £12.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £131.20k £328.08k £606.59k £757.66k £678.53k
Expenditure - Governance £10.24k £12.65k £7.48k £8.61k £12.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £997.99k £6.95m £510.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £131.20k £328.08k £606.59k £757.66k £59.87k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0