UWE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1143067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 July 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 July 2020 38 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 12 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 April 2017 On time Download