SESKU ACADEMY

Charity number: 1143258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 June 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 15 June 2020 46 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 17 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 17 November 2016 On time Download