CAMBRIDGE ROAD ESTATES COMMUNITY GROUP ( CREST)

Charity number: 1144268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £3.32k £3.02k £8.14k £3.38k £20.60k
Total expenditure £4.78k £2.65k £3.89k £4.02k £5.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k