Trustees STRATFORD UPON AVON CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 502020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE GOUGH | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary McKinty | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Vandome | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Hutchison | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Peter Moore-Bridger | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Harrison | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh Mary Douglas | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Statham | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glenda Winifred Kershaw | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ruth Alexandra Jackson | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Macvie | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.