BEANI BAZAR WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1144944
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £72.91k £47.70k £35.19k £17.62k £46.42k
Total expenditure £37.87k £43.24k £32.31k £19.45k £11.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A