Financial history THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-ALDERSGATE

Charity number: 1144366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £208.99k £212.37k £229.73k £211.55k £239.10k
Total expenditure £201.85k £218.73k £215.78k £218.40k £195.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A