Trustees THE GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-ALDERSGATE

Charity number: 1144366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SIMON DOWDY Chair 23 August 2011
None on record
Louise Biller Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Sharon Facey Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Kwai San Wong Trustee 31 December 2020
None on record
Philip Martin Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
Victoria Rolfe Trustee 31 May 2015
None on record
Li Tjen Sim Trustee 31 May 2015
None on record
Andrew Lewis Trustee 01 January 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS, OAKWOOD
Received: On time
Charles de Lacy Trustee 31 December 2012
None on record
Hugh Gittins Trustee 23 August 2011
THE BIBLE TALKS
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH MAYFAIR
Received: On time
DAVID MICHAEL DURLACHER Trustee 23 August 2011
THE FORDHAM TRUST
Received: On time
MARK THOMAS CROSSLEY Trustee 23 August 2011
None on record