Trustees UNIVERSITY OF HERTFORDSHIRE STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1143101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
robert walder | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Divya Maheshwaram | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chizobam Ezekchukwu | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Akinyemi Daniel Lawal | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajiv Sudan | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lucy Atkinson | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluronke Oluwalere | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Manoj Nagireddy | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hamnah Baig | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Umar Mohamad | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mairi Watson | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.