THE NOTTINGHAM & NOTTINGHAMSHIRE VICTORIA CROSS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1144298
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £3.40k £123 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.99k £96 £0 £0 £152
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0