Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD: VICTORY ASSEMBLY SIDCUP

Charity number: 1143076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £152.89k £117.91k £97.00k £122.14k £158.20k
Total expenditure £103.05k £102.82k £106.00k £89.10k £84.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A