BLACKPOOL ICE DROME CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143903
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 April 2017 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 12 April 2017 71 days late Download