Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, FAREHAM
Charity number: 1143777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT IAN CRANSTONE | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Hicks | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ursulla Odessa Lewis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Harold Arnell | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
June Carol Haye | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Joy Coutts | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Jarman | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas McCorkell | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Cranstone | Trustee | 13 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Duboc | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stevenson | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
LIZ WEBB | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ANNE HICKS | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF COLLINS | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUE LUPTON | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.