Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LEONARD, HYTHE

Charity number: 1144695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £180.25k £196.68k £128.11k £107.42k £901.46k
Total expenditure £160.76k £242.53k £145.41k £146.90k £148.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £881.79k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.66k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £7
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £774.07k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £148.07k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.41k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0