Financial history EL-KWABOAT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1143434
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.05k £15.90k £20.98k £101.35k £102.29k
Total expenditure £8.82k £10.11k £17.36k £96.46k £102.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A