YOU RAISE ME UP LIMITED

Charity number: 1147534
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 July 2020 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 23 July 2020 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 July 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 July 2019 47 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 01 October 2018 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 03 October 2018 125 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 May 2017 On time Download