TRANSFORMATION CPR

Charity number: 1146238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 March 2021 131 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 May 2020 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 May 2020 185 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 May 2019 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 May 2019 200 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 May 2017 On time Download