GATEWAY CHURCH BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1144050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £73.69k £88.60k £76.99k £123.20k £75.03k
Total expenditure £63.71k £81.80k £68.43k £78.14k £80.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A