UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1144146
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 June 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 June 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 03 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 29 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 31 March 2017 On time Download