UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1144146
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.42m £7.01m £7.01m £7.71m £6.25m
Total expenditure £7.20m £8.87m £7.26m £8.36m £8.45m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.37m £2.50m £2.57m £2.63m £2.58m
Income - Other trading activities £4.43m £4.09m £4.16m £4.86m £3.26m
Income - Charitable activities £607.71k £416.77k £275.23k £224.04k £401.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £179.09k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.22k £1.57k £739 £795 £3.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £2.32m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.78m £2.70m £2.60m £2.93m £2.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.41m £4.32m £4.54m £5.09m £3.52m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £34.62k £36.27k £41.51k £39.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.85m £124.59k £341.28k £2.44m