SWANFIELD CHAPEL

Charity number: 1143499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 January 2019 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 January 2019 69 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 December 2016 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 December 2016 43 days late Download