ASHRAYA NEPAL-UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1144306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 June 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 21 June 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 21 June 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 21 June 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 21 June 2016 17 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 June 2016 Not Required