Accounts and annual returns KEREN HABINYAN LIMITED

Charity number: 1144177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 28 March 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 27 December 2018 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required