INNER VOICES

Charity number: 1144419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £38.43k £12.00k £33.26k £23.00k £22.94k
Total expenditure £42.74k £15.00k £23.36k £15.00k £15.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A