THE CHALFONT ST PETER COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1144104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 May 2017 On time Download